Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB822 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

                    By: Canales, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 822
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating April as Sexual Assault Awareness Month.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.111 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.111.  SEXUAL ASSAULT AWARENESS MONTH.  (a)  April is
 Sexual Assault Awareness Month to increase awareness and prevention
 of sexual assault.
 (b)  Sexual Assault Awareness Month may be regularly
 observed through appropriate activities in public schools and other
 places to increase awareness and prevention of sexual assault.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *