E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/24/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3978
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1447
|
Journal Page: 3978
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3743
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Birdwell
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#661
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2276
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 2276
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2276
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1843
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 458
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 458
|
House
|
01/05/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|