Senate | 05/19/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1361 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2111 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#553 | Journal Page: 2110 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2110 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2110 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2052 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2052 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 391 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 391 | |
House | 01/05/2017 | Filed |