Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1918 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3492 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Record vote | RV#1209 | Journal Page: 3404 |
House | 05/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3404 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3404 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3280 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3280 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Amended | 1-E. Thompson | Journal Page: 3280 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3279 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Postponed | 5/11/17 3:50 AM | Journal Page: 3223 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3223 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1475 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 392 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 392 | |
House | 01/06/2017 | Filed |