Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2110
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2603
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#813
|
Journal Page: 2602
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2602
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2602
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#718
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Capriglione
|
Journal Page: 2448
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
3-Capriglione
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Capriglione
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/3/17 4:16 PM
|
Journal Page: 2399
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2399
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 453
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 453
|
House
|
01/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|