Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB873 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Pickett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 873
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 8, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 8, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting certain establishments serving the public
 from restricting a peace officer or special investigator from
 carrying a weapon on the premises.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 2.1305 to read as follows:
 Art. 2.1305.  CARRYING WEAPON ON CERTAIN PREMISES.  (a)  An
 establishment serving the public may not prohibit or otherwise
 restrict a peace officer or special investigator from carrying on
 the establishment's premises a weapon that the peace officer or
 special investigator is otherwise authorized to carry, regardless
 of whether the peace officer or special investigator is engaged in
 the actual discharge of the officer's or investigator's duties
 while carrying the weapon.
 (b)  For purposes of this article:
 (1)  "Establishment serving the public" means:
 (A)  a hotel, motel, or other place of lodging;
 (B)  a restaurant or other place where food is
 offered for sale to the public;
 (C)  a retail business or other commercial
 establishment or an office building to which the general public is
 invited;
 (D)  a sports venue; and
 (E)  any other place of public accommodation,
 amusement, convenience, or resort to which the general public or
 any classification of persons from the general public is regularly,
 normally, or customarily invited.
 (2)  "Sports venue" means an arena, coliseum, stadium,
 or other type of area or facility that is primarily used or is
 planned for primary use for one or more professional or amateur
 sports or athletics events and for which a fee is charged or is
 planned to be charged for admission to the sports or athletics
 events, other than occasional civic, charitable, or promotional
 events.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to conduct that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
 Conduct that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the conduct occurred, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *