Senate | 05/19/2017 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 2242 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2021 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1826 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1531 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1531 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1459 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Record vote | RV#229 | Journal Page: 1458 |
House | 04/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1458 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1458 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1443 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1443 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 454 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 454 | |
House | 01/09/2017 | Filed |