Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB878 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: King of Hemphill, Fallon H.B. No. 878
 (Senate Sponsor - Perry)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 16, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 878 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extension and modification of a public school
 district depository contract.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 45.205(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A school district and the district's depository bank may
 agree to extend a depository contract for three [two] additional
 two-year terms. The contract may be modified for each two-year
 extension if both parties mutually agree to the terms. An extension
 under this subsection is not subject to the requirements of Section
 45.206.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *