Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB88 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Martinez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 88
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 9, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an unlawful employment practice by an employer whose
 leave policy does not permit an employee to use leave to care for
 the employee's foster child.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Labor Code, is amended
 by adding Section 21.0595 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0595.  DISCRIMINATORY LEAVE POLICY AFFECTING
 EMPLOYEE'S ENTITLEMENT TO PERSONAL LEAVE TO CARE FOR SICK FOSTER
 CHILD. An employer commits an unlawful employment practice if:
 (1)  the employer administers a leave policy under
 which an employee is entitled to personal leave to care for or
 otherwise assist the employee's sick child; and
 (2)  the leave policy described by Subdivision (1) does
 not treat in the same manner as an employee's biological or adopted
 minor child any foster child of the employee who:
 (A)  resides in the same household as the
 employee; and
 (B)  is under the conservatorship of the
 Department of Family and Protective Services.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.0595, Labor Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a claim of discrimination based on conduct that
 occurs on or after the effective date of this Act. A claim of
 discrimination that is based on conduct that occurs before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the conduct occurred, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *