E | 05/19/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/19/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4005 | |
E | 05/10/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3391 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1760 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3055 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3156 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3023 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 937 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1431 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1124 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#151 | Journal Page: 1123 |
House | 04/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1123 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1123 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1098 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Record vote | RV#146 | Journal Page: 1098 |
House | 04/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1098 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1097 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 455 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 455 | |
House | 01/09/2017 | Filed |