E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5565
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4569
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2573
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#580
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Stickland
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 392
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 392
|
House
|
01/10/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|