E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#2051
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5069
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5069
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5069
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5068
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1847
|
Journal Page: 5068
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 5068
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5068
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3; Article III, Section 30, Article III, Section 35, More
|
Journal Page: 5067
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4569
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Taylor of Galveston
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2651
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1906
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3456
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3274
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1169
|
Journal Page: 3273
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3273
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3273
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1140
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 394
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 394
|
House
|
01/11/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|