E | 05/29/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6063 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5095 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4358 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4366 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3995 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2233 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2233 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2233 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2233 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2233 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2233 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2233 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2021 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1343 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | RV#474 | Journal Page: 1962 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1962 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1962 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 472 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 472 | |
House | 01/12/2017 | Filed |