Senate | 05/16/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1693 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2822 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#954 | Journal Page: 2822 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2822 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2821 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2725 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Record vote | RV#865 | Journal Page: 2725 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2725 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2724 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 473 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 473 | |
House | 01/12/2017 | Filed |