Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB988 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/12/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R6716 PAM-D
 By: González of El Paso H.B. No. 988


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a pilot program under which public schools
 may develop a portfolio method to assess student performance in
 grades three through eight for purposes of accountability and
 qualification for promotion.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.02302 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.02302.  PORTFOLIO ASSESSMENT PILOT PROGRAM FOR
 GRADES THREE THROUGH EIGHT. (a) The commissioner shall establish a
 pilot program as provided by this section under which participating
 school districts may:
 (1)  implement a portfolio method to assess students in
 grades three through eight; and
 (2)  use student performance under that method as a
 percentage of a student's overall performance on assessment
 instruments, in addition to the student's performance on assessment
 instruments required under Sections 39.023(a), (b), and (l), for
 purposes of accountability under this chapter and qualification for
 promotion under Section 28.0211.
 (b)  A school district may choose to participate in the pilot
 program established under this section by submitting to the
 commissioner for approval not later than May 1, 2018, a plan
 described by this subsection and approved by the board of trustees
 of the district. A school district that chooses to participate in
 the pilot program must create a committee that consists of teachers
 and administrators employed by and students enrolled in the
 district to develop a three-year plan that:
 (1)  specifies the goals and guiding principles for
 implementation of the district's portfolio assessment method;
 (2)  designates for assessment by the portfolio
 assessment method:
 (A)  English language arts;
 (B)  mathematics; and
 (C)  any other subject as determined by the
 committee;
 (3)  specifies the essential knowledge and skills that
 must be addressed by the portfolio method of assessment for each
 subject designated under Subdivision (2);
 (4)  designates the grades subject to portfolio
 assessment;
 (5)  provides for accommodations and any other support
 measures that comply with applicable federal law for students
 enrolled in a special education program under Subchapter A, Chapter
 29, and students of limited English proficiency, as defined by
 Section 29.052;
 (6)  includes requirements for using components of the
 portfolio assessment as:
 (A)  an interim formative assessment tool to
 provide the student the opportunity to further develop
 understanding and performance; and
 (B)  a final summative assessment;
 (7)  includes the method of submitting student
 portfolios, which may include written submission, digital
 delivery, an oral defense presentation, or a combination of those
 methods; and
 (8)  includes a rubric for grading student portfolios
 as provided by Subsection (c).
 (c)  The rubric included in the plan developed under
 Subsection (b) must be developed by district teachers. In
 developing the rubric, the district teachers may incorporate
 suggestions from students enrolled in the district and community
 and business leaders. The rubric must be based on a 100-point scale
 scoring system and must establish a level of performance considered
 satisfactory and a level of performance necessary to indicate
 college readiness.
 (d)  Subject to the Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act
 of 1974 (20 U.S.C. Section 1232g), the plan developed under
 Subsection (b) may provide for the use of portfolio assessments for
 other purposes, including to:
 (1)  evaluate teacher performance;
 (2)  assist in developing campus turnaround plans and
 other campus improvement initiatives under Subchapter E;
 (3)  assist in communicating with the student's parents
 regarding the student's academic development; or
 (4)  provide relevant information in admission,
 review, and dismissal committee and language proficiency
 assessment committee meetings.
 (e)  The commissioner shall review and make a determination
 on each plan submitted under this section on or before August 1,
 2018. To participate in the pilot program, a school district must
 implement a plan approved by the commissioner under this section
 beginning with the 2018-2019 school year.
 (f)  For purposes of the pilot program, if a scale score
 required for satisfactory performance under Section 39.0241(a) on
 an assessment instrument required under Section 39.023(a), (b), or
 (l) is not based on a 100-point scale scoring system, the
 commissioner shall provide for a conversion, in accordance with
 commissioner rule, of the scale score to an equivalent score based
 on a 100-point scale scoring system. A student's performance under
 the portfolio assessment method for a grade and subject shall be
 combined with the student's performance on the assessment
 instrument administered under Section 39.023(a), (b), or (l), as
 applicable, for that grade and subject to determine the student's
 overall performance. For purposes of assigning districts and
 campuses a performance rating under Section 39.054, a student's
 performance under the portfolio assessment method for a grade and
 subject is considered as 50 percent of the student's overall
 performance. For purposes of determining whether a student
 performed satisfactorily on an assessment instrument required
 under Section 28.0211 to qualify for promotion, a student's
 performance under the portfolio assessment method for the
 applicable grade and subject is considered as 65 percent of the
 student's overall performance.
 (g)  For purposes of assigning districts and campuses a
 performance rating under Section 39.054, the commissioner shall
 consider districts and campuses participating in the pilot program
 separately. The commissioner shall adopt rules to substitute a
 student's overall performance computed as provided by Subsection
 (f) for purposes of accountability for the student's performance on
 assessment instruments required under Section 39.023(a), (b), or
 (l), as applicable.
 (h)  A school district that participates in the pilot program
 shall provide student performance data to the agency as required by
 agency rule. The agency shall periodically review the performance
 data submitted under this subsection.
 (i)  The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section, including:
 (1)  rules for submitting to the commissioner for
 approval a plan described by Subsection (b) and subsequent
 amendments to the plan;
 (2)  rules for evaluating submitted plans and
 amendments described by Subdivision (1);
 (3)  rules for submitting student performance data to
 the agency as required under Subsection (h); and
 (4)  any specific rules for school districts or
 campuses that are rated unacceptable and choose to participate in
 the pilot program under this section.
 (j)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the agency shall
 prepare and deliver to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer
 of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction
 over primary and secondary education a report that:
 (1)  evaluates the implementation and performance
 results of the pilot program under this section; and
 (2)  makes recommendations regarding the feasibility
 of statewide application of establishing a portfolio method to
 assess student performance in grades three through eight for
 purposes of accountability and qualification for promotion.
 (k)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.