Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB989 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/12/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R6717 PAM-D
 By: González of El Paso H.B. No. 989


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a pilot program under which public schools
 may develop a portfolio method to assess secondary-level student
 performance for purposes of accountability and qualification for
 graduation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.02303 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.02303.  PORTFOLIO ASSESSMENT PILOT PROGRAM FOR
 SECONDARY-LEVEL STUDENTS. (a) The commissioner shall establish a
 pilot program as provided by this section under which participating
 school districts may:
 (1)  implement a portfolio method to assess students
 enrolled in secondary-level courses; and
 (2)  use student performance under that method as a
 percentage of a student's overall performance on assessment
 instruments, in addition to the student's performance on assessment
 instruments required under Section 39.023(c), for purposes of
 accountability under this chapter and determining qualification
 for graduation.
 (b)  A school district may choose to participate in the pilot
 program established under this section by submitting to the
 commissioner for approval not later than May 1, 2018, a plan
 described by this subsection and approved by the board of trustees
 of the district. A school district that chooses to participate in
 the pilot program must create a committee that consists of teachers
 and administrators employed by and students enrolled in the
 district to develop a three-year plan that:
 (1)  specifies the goals and guiding principles for
 implementation of the district's portfolio assessment method;
 (2)  designates for assessment by the portfolio
 assessment method courses in:
 (A)  Algebra I;
 (B)  English I and English II; and
 (C)  any other course as determined by the
 committee;
 (3)  specifies the essential knowledge and skills that
 must be addressed by the portfolio method of assessment for each
 course designated under Subdivision (2);
 (4)  provides for accommodations and any other support
 measures that comply with applicable federal law for students
 enrolled in a special education program under Subchapter A, Chapter
 29, and students of limited English proficiency, as defined by
 Section 29.052;
 (5)  includes requirements for using components of the
 portfolio assessment as:
 (A)  an interim formative assessment tool to
 provide the student the opportunity to further develop
 understanding and performance; and
 (B)  a final summative assessment;
 (6)  includes the method for submitting student
 portfolios, which may include written submission, digital
 delivery, an oral defense presentation, or a combination of those
 methods; and
 (7)  includes a rubric for grading student portfolios
 as provided by Subsection (c).
 (c)  The rubric included in the plan developed under
 Subsection (b) must be developed by district teachers. In
 developing the rubric, the district teachers may incorporate
 suggestions from students enrolled in the district and community
 and business leaders. The rubric must be based on a 100-point scale
 scoring system and must establish a level of performance considered
 satisfactory and a level of performance necessary to indicate
 college readiness.
 (d)  Subject to the Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act
 of 1974 (20 U.S.C. Section 1232g), the plan developed under
 Subsection (b) may provide for the use of portfolio assessments for
 other purposes, including:
 (1)  to evaluate teacher performance;
 (2)  to assist in developing campus turnaround plans
 and other campus improvement initiatives under Subchapter E;
 (3)  to assist in communicating with the student's
 parents regarding the student's academic development;
 (4)  to provide relevant information in admission,
 review, and dismissal committee and language proficiency
 assessment committee meetings;
 (5)  as a course completion requirement; or
 (6)  as a factor in determining a student's
 qualification for graduation by any committee established to make
 such a determination.
 (e)  The commissioner shall review and make a determination
 on each plan submitted under this section on or before August 1,
 2018. To participate in the pilot program, a school district must
 implement a plan approved by the commissioner under this section
 beginning with the 2018-2019 school year.
 (f)  A student's performance under the portfolio assessment
 method for a secondary-level course shall be combined with the
 student's performance on the comparable assessment instrument
 administered under Section 39.023(c) for that secondary-level
 course to determine the student's overall performance. For purposes
 of assigning districts and campuses a performance rating under
 Section 39.054, a student's performance under the portfolio
 assessment method for a secondary-level course is considered as 50
 percent of the student's overall performance. For purposes of
 determining whether a student performed satisfactorily on an
 end-of-course assessment instrument to qualify for graduation, a
 student's performance under the portfolio assessment method for a
 secondary-level course is considered as 65 percent of the student's
 overall performance.
 (g)  For purposes of assigning districts and campuses a
 performance rating under Section 39.054, the commissioner shall
 consider districts and campuses participating in the pilot program
 separately. The commissioner shall adopt rules to substitute a
 student's overall performance computed as provided by Subsection
 (f) for purposes of accountability for the student's performance on
 assessment instruments required under Section 39.023(c).
 (h)  A school district that participates in the pilot program
 shall provide student performance data to the agency as required by
 agency rule. The agency shall periodically review the performance
 data submitted under this subsection.
 (i)  The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section, including:
 (1)  rules for submitting to the commissioner for
 approval a plan described by Subsection (b) and subsequent
 amendments to the plan;
 (2)  rules for evaluating submitted plans and
 amendments described by Subdivision (1);
 (3)  rules for submitting student performance data to
 the agency as required under Subsection (h); and
 (4)  any specific rules for school districts or
 campuses that are rated unacceptable and choose to participate in
 the pilot program under this section.
 (j)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the agency shall
 prepare and deliver to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer
 of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction
 over primary and secondary education a report that:
 (1)  evaluates the implementation and performance
 results of the pilot program under this section; and
 (2)  makes recommendations regarding the feasibility
 of statewide application of establishing a portfolio method to
 assess secondary-level student performance for purposes of
 accountability and qualification for graduation.
 (k)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.