Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB999 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Israel, Laubenberg (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 999
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 2, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the election of directors of certain
 districts to be held on a uniform election date.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 49.103(b), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Unless a district holds its general election for
 officers on a date as otherwise provided by statute, after [After]
 confirmation of a district, an election shall be held on the uniform
 election date, provided by Section 41.001, Election Code, in May of
 each even-numbered year to elect the appropriate number of
 directors.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *