Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2071
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1046
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1843
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 1020
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|