House | 05/04/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2759 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 1020 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Filed |