05/04/2017 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/26/2017 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Filed |