06/12/2017 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/28/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Administration | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Filed |