06/12/2017 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/29/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/28/2017 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/28/2017 | Read | ||
Senate | 05/28/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/28/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 05/28/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/28/2017 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Filed |