Senate | 05/29/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/29/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 05/29/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/29/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/26/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Filed |