House | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 02/15/2017 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 323 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |