E | 01/31/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 220 | |
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 142 | |
House | 01/30/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 189 | |
House | 01/25/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 189 | |
House | 01/24/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 01/18/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 42 | |
Senate | 01/18/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 42 | |
Senate | 01/18/2017 | Read | Journal Page: 42 | |
Senate | 01/18/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 42 | |
Senate | 01/18/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 41 | |
House | 01/18/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 168 | |
House | 01/18/2017 | Record vote | RV#16 | Journal Page: 167 |
House | 01/18/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 167 | |
House | 01/18/2017 | Filed |