House | 05/12/2017 | Record vote | RV#1249 | Journal Page: 3440 |
House | 05/12/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 582 | |
House | 01/30/2017 | Filed |