E | 03/02/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 572 | |
E | 02/21/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 298 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 377 | |
House | 02/15/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 271 | |
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 245 | |
House | 02/08/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 249 | |
House | 02/08/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 249 | |
House | 02/01/2017 | Filed |