E | 02/22/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 462 | |
E | 02/14/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 329 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 262 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 288 | |
House | 02/09/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 288 | |
House | 02/08/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 237 | |
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 207 | |
House | 02/07/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 238 | |
House | 02/07/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 238 | |
House | 02/06/2017 | Filed |