E | 04/05/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1424 | |
E | 03/28/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 940 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 720 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 912 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 914 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 468 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 593 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 593 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 583 | |
House | 02/07/2017 | Filed |