E | 04/12/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1509 | |
E | 04/05/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 892 | |
House | 04/03/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1066 | |
House | 04/02/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1068 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1030 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 420 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 548 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 548 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Filed |