E | 03/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1032 | |
E | 03/21/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 580 | |
House | 03/20/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 749 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 750 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 485 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 398 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 502 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 502 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Filed |