E | 03/16/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 750 | |
E | 03/08/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 442 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 571 | |
House | 03/03/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 572 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 330 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 434 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 434 | |
House | 02/22/2017 | Filed |