E | 05/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3391 | |
E | 05/02/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2460 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1506 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2188 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1974 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 937 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1115 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1115 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1019 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Filed |