Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1369 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | RV#489 | Journal Page: 1998 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 1699 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1699 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 835 | |
House | 02/24/2017 | Filed |