Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR91 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R22668 TK-D
 By: Laubenberg, Leach H.C.R. No. 91
 Substitute the following for H.C.R. No. 91:
 By:  Laubenberg C.S.H.C.R. No. 91


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Barbara Stegall, individually and as representative
 of the estate of Joe Stegall, alleges that:
 (1)  in the spring of 2014, Joe Stegall began
 experiencing fevers and a feeling of being unwell;
 (2)  Mr. Stegall was employed as the chief financial
 officer for the City of Royse City, Texas, and as a city employee,
 was eligible for, and participated in, the city's medical and
 prescription drug insurance provided by the Texas Municipal League
 and TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc.;
 (3)  the Texas Municipal League and TML MultiState
 Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., provided medical
 and prescription drug coverage to Joe and Barbara Stegall, and UMR,
 Inc., was the third-party administrator;
 (4)  in May 2014, Mr. Stegall felt ill, and was taken to
 the hospital by Mrs. Stegall and was admitted, examined, and
 informed that he had cholangiocarcinoma, more commonly known as
 bile duct cancer;
 (5)  Mr. Stegall returned home to form a treatment plan
 with his oncologist, Dr. Ahmer Younas at Texas Oncology in Rowlett,
 Texas, and made an appointment with a second oncologist,
 Dr. Douglas Orr at Texas Oncology in Dallas, Texas;
 (6)  in subsequent appointments, Dr. Younas and
 Dr. Orr advised Mr. Stegall that he had cholangiocarcinoma, bile
 duct cancer, and hepatocellular carcinoma, liver cancer;
 (7)  Dr. Younas advised Mr. Stegall to start
 chemotherapy for the bile duct cancer first and add another form of
 chemotherapy for the liver cancer at a later date, and Mr. Stegall
 promptly began a chemotherapy regimen of gemcitabine and cisplatin
 to treat the bile duct cancer;
 (8)  as a result of the positive response Mr. Stegall
 exhibited to chemotherapy, on October 23, 2014, Dr. Younas
 recommended that Mr. Stegall add to his chemotherapy regimen
 another drug that would target the liver cancer;
 (9)  Dr. Younas prescribed sorafenib, known in the
 United States by the brand name Nexavar, in tablet form to treat the
 liver cancer, and sought authorization for the drug from the Texas
 Municipal League and TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee
 Benefits Pool, Inc.;
 (10)  Nexavar is FDA-approved for the treatment of
 hepatocellular carcinoma, from which Mr. Stegall suffered, and
 Nexavar increases the survival rates and life expectancy of
 patients with advanced liver cancer;
 (11)  the Texas Municipal League and TML MultiState
 Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., refused to
 authorize the drug for Mr. Stegall, and on October 30, 2014, a
 written denial signed by Carol Padgett, RN, BSN, CCM, Medical
 Intelligence Care Management, on TML MultiState Intergovernmental
 Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., letterhead was sent to Mr. Stegall,
 at the address of Texas Oncology, citing as the basis for the denial
 that, "The requested service was determined to be unproven.";
 (12)  Dr. Younas persisted in efforts to obtain
 chemotherapy for Mr. Stegall and engaged in a telephone conference
 with Dr. Philip Schulman, an employee or agent of the Texas
 Municipal League, TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee
 Benefits Pool, Inc., or UMR, Inc.;
 (13)  Dr. Younas learned that Dr. Schulman, and by
 extension, the Texas Municipal League, TML MultiState
 Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., and UMR, Inc., did
 not believe that Mr. Stegall had liver cancer;
 (14)  due to the urgency of Mr. Stegall's need,
 Dr. Younas and his staff immediately began efforts to procure
 Nexavar for Mr. Stegall without insurance and at no cost to
 Mr. Stegall through a Resources for Expert Assistance and Care
 Helpline program;
 (15)  the Texas Municipal League and TML MultiState
 Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., acted
 intentionally to discourage Mr. Stegall from obtaining Nexavar;
 (16)  on November 5, 2014, PMC Multistate Case Manager
 Carol West, an employee or agent of the Texas Municipal League, TML
 MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., or UMR,
 Inc., advised Dr. Younas's staff that the Texas Municipal League
 and TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc.,
 would terminate all of Mr. Stegall's future coverage if he took
 Nexavar and experienced complications from it;
 (17)  the communication caused Mr. and Mrs. Stegall to
 believe that the Texas Municipal League and TML MultiState
 Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., were looking for
 reason to cease payment for Mr. Stegall's treatment, and that any
 attempt to circumvent coverage decisions by the Texas Municipal
 League and TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits
 Pool, Inc., would be met with immediate termination of all
 benefits;
 (18)  the attempt of the Texas Municipal League and TML
 MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., to
 cease coverage for Mr. Stegall's treatment, and allow his death,
 had a devastating impact on Mr. Stegall's demeanor and spirit, and
 caused both Mr. and Mrs. Stegall severe mental distress;
 (19)  on November 11, 2014, Dr. Younas's staff was
 contacted regarding difficulties verifying the status of
 Mr. Stegall's insurance coverage, and Dr. Younas's office
 responded by resubmitting the authorization request for Nexavar to
 confirm the absence of coverage;
 (20)  on November 21, 2014, the Texas Municipal League
 and TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc.,
 suddenly and without explanation, reversed course and authorized
 the Nexavar;
 (21)  the coverage decision was conveyed in a telephone
 call initiated by Dr. Younas's office, and the Texas Municipal
 League and TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits
 Pool, Inc., did not take any affirmative steps to notify
 Mr. Stegall of its change in decision;
 (22)  for Mr. Stegall and his family, the reversal came
 too late, and over the course of four excruciating weeks, during
 which time Mr. Stegall, Dr. Younas, and Dr. Younas's staff worked
 tirelessly to obtain the Nexavar, Mr. Stegall's condition
 worsened;
 (23)  Mr. Stegall was admitted to the hospital on
 Friday, December 12, 2014, where he died four days later;
 (24)  the Texas Municipal League and TML MultiState
 Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., and its agents,
 including UMR, Inc., denied Mr. Stegall access to Nexavar both
 directly by denying coverage and indirectly by threatening to end
 all coverage if he obtained Nexavar without the approval of Texas
 Municipal League and TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee
 Benefits Pool, Inc., or UMR, Inc., thus denying Mr. Stegall
 coverage to which he had a contractual right, as well as the medical
 benefits of timely access to the Nexavar;
 (25)  the wrongful and intentional acts of the Texas
 Municipal League, TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee
 Benefits Pool, Inc., and UMR, Inc., ultimately caused Mr. Stegall's
 premature death on December 16, 2014, at the age of 60;
 (26)  the actions of the Texas Municipal League, TML
 MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., and
 UMR, Inc., demonstrate gross negligence and a wilful intent to
 deprive Mr. Stegall of the benefits of his coverage and of his life
 for the sake of financial economy; and
 (27)  the Texas Municipal League, TML MultiState
 Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., and UMR, Inc., must
 be held liable; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 Barbara Stegall is granted permission to sue the Texas Municipal
 League, TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool,
 Inc., and UMR, Inc., for wrongful death, negligence, breach of
 contract, breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing, and
 violations of the Texas Insurance Code and Texas Deceptive Trade
 Practices-Consumer Protection Act, subject to Chapter 107, Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That if Barbara Stegall is successful in proving
 her allegation against the Texas Municipal League, TML MultiState
 Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., and UMR, Inc.,
 Mrs. Stegall is entitled to an award of actual, compensatory, and
 statutory damages and reasonable attorney's fees and costs
 authorized by law; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the suit authorized by this resolution shall
 be brought in Dallas County; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the attorney general, the Texas Commissioner
 of Insurance, the executive director of the Texas Municipal League,
 and the chairman of the board of TML MultiState Intergovernmental
 Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., be served process as provided by
 Section 107.002(a)(3), Civil Practice and Remedies Code.