Senate | 04/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 937 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1115 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1115 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1020 | |
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed |