Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1915 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1915 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1773 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3051 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1045 | Journal Page: 3050 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3050 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3050 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 1020 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed |