Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR10 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.J.R. No. 10
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment changing the eligibility
 requirements for certain judicial offices.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2(b), Article V, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  No person shall be eligible to serve in the office of
 Chief Justice or Justice of the Supreme Court unless the person is
 licensed to practice law in the State of Texas [this state] and is,
 at the time of election, a citizen of the United States and of the
 State of Texas [this state], and has attained the age of thirty-five
 years, and has been a practicing lawyer licensed in the State of
 Texas for at least ten years, or has been a practicing lawyer
 licensed in the State of Texas and judge of a state court or county
 court established by the Legislature by statute for a combined
 total of [court of record together] at least ten years, during which
 time the person's license to practice law has not been revoked,
 suspended, or subject to a probated suspension.
 SECTION 2.  Section 7, Article V, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7.  The State shall be divided into judicial districts,
 with each district having one or more Judges as may be provided by
 law or by this Constitution. Each district judge shall be elected
 by the qualified voters at a General Election and shall be a citizen
 of the United States and of this State, who is licensed to practice
 law in this State and has been a practicing lawyer or a Judge of a
 Court in this State, or both combined, for six [four (4)] years next
 preceding the judge's [his] election, during which time the judge's
 license to practice law has not been revoked, suspended, or subject
 to a probated suspension, who has resided in the district in which
 the judge [he] was elected for two [(2)] years next preceding the
 [his] election, and who shall reside in the [his] district during
 the judge's [his] term of office and hold the [his] office for the
 period of four [(4)] years, and who shall receive for the judge's
 [his] services an annual salary to be fixed by the Legislature. The
 Court shall conduct its proceedings at the county seat of the county
 in which the case is pending, except as otherwise provided by law.
 The judge [He] shall hold the regular terms of the judge's [his]
 Court at the County Seat of each County in the [his] district in
 such manner as may be prescribed by law. The Legislature shall have
 power by General or Special Laws to make such provisions concerning
 the terms or sessions of each Court as it may deem necessary.
 The Legislature shall also provide for the holding of
 District Court when the Judge thereof is absent, or is from any
 cause disabled or disqualified from presiding.
 SECTION 3.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2017, changing the eligibility requirements for a
 justice of the supreme court, a judge of the court of criminal
 appeals, a justice of a court of appeals, and a district judge.
 (b)  The amendment to Section 2(b), Article V, of this
 constitution takes effect January 1, 2018, and applies only to a
 chief justice or other justice of the supreme court, a presiding
 judge or other judge of the court of criminal appeals, or a chief
 justice or other justice of a court of appeals who is first elected
 for a term that begins on or after January 1, 2021, or who is
 appointed on or after that date.
 (c)  The amendment to Section 7, Article V, of this
 constitution takes effect January 1, 2018, and applies only to a
 district judge who is first elected for a term that begins on or
 after January 1, 2021, or who is appointed on or after that date.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 4.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment changing the
 eligibility requirements for a justice of the supreme court, a
 judge of the court of criminal appeals, a justice of a court of
 appeals, and a district judge."
 * * * * *