Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR114 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/14/2017

                            By: Burrows H.J.R. No. 114


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to divert any net income
 attributable to newly discovered oil and gas or other mineral
 interests on permanent university fund land from the permanent
 university fund to fund capital projects at certain public
 univer
 sities and agencies of higher education that are currently
 ineligible for distributions from the permanent university fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 15-a to read as follows:
 Sec. 15-a.  Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 constitution, any net income, including royalties, attributable to
 oil and gas or other mineral interests discovered on or after
 January 1, 2015, on permanent university fund land shall be
 deposited to the credit of the state treasury and may be used only
 for distribution to eligible public universities and agencies of
 higher education under Section 17(a) in accordance with that
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 17(a), Article VII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In the fiscal year beginning September 1, 1985, and each
 fiscal year thereafter, there is hereby appropriated out of funds
 deposited to the state treasury under Section 15-a, and out of the
 first money coming into the state treasury not otherwise
 appropriated by the constitution, a total of $100 million to be used
 by eligible agencies and institutions of higher education for the
 purpose of acquiring land either with or without permanent
 improvements, constructing and equipping buildings or other
 permanent improvements, major repair or rehabilitation of
 buildings or other permanent improvements, acquisition of capital
 equipment, library books and library materials, and paying for
 acquiring, constructing, or equipping or for major repair or
 rehabilitation of buildings, facilities, other permanent
 improvements, or capital equipment used jointly for educational and
 general activities and for auxiliary enterprises to the extent of
 their use for educational and general activities. For the
 five-year period that begins on September 1, 2000, and for each
 five-year period that begins after that period, the legislature,
 during a regular session that is nearest, but preceding, a
 five-year period, may by two-thirds vote of the membership of each
 house increase the amount of the constitutional appropriation for
 the five-year period but may not adjust the appropriation in such a
 way as to impair any obligation created by the issuance of bonds or
 notes in accordance with this section.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to divert any net
 income attributable to newly discovered oil and gas or other
 mineral interests on permanent university fund land from the
 permanent university fund to fund capital projects at certain
 public universities and agencies of higher education that are
 currently ineligible for distributions from the permanent
 university fund."