E | 05/30/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 6063 | |
Senate | 05/27/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3786 | |
House | 05/26/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5565 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5573 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4574 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2703 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2703 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2703 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2703 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2703 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2703 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2702 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2878 | |
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2112 | |
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3156 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2955 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | RV#1027 | Journal Page: 2955 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2955 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2955 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 288 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 288 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |