House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 03/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed |