House | 05/08/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Filed |