Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1140 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/12/2017

                    H.R. No. 1140


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The heroic military service of Ramiro L. Esquivel
 was recognized by Alaniz-Valentine Chapter 598 of the Military
 Order of the Purple Heart at a ceremony aboard the USS Lexington in
 Corpus Christi on February 28, 2017; and
 WHEREAS, One of our nation's highest military commendations,
 the Purple Heart is awarded to members of the U.S. armed forces who
 have been wounded or killed in combat; the Military Order of the
 Purple Heart is a veterans organization founded in 1932 that draws
 its membership from individuals who have received the medal; and
 WHEREAS, Purple Heart recipient Ramiro L. Esquivel served his
 nation in Korea as a member of the U.S. Army, and he was wounded in
 action on August 30, 1950, September 22, 1950, and January 13, 1951;
 and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Esquivel was one of 16 living Purple Heart
 recipients who were recognized at the ceremony in Corpus Christi,
 along with two others who lost their lives in the line of duty;
 among those paying tribute to the honorees were Brigadier General
 James Mobley, Vietnam veteran J. R. Pena, and the color guard of the
 W. B. Ray High School Naval Junior ROTC; and
 WHEREAS, Americans owe a profound debt of gratitude to Ramiro
 L. Esquivel for putting himself in harm's way to defend our freedom,
 and his selfless efforts are a source of inspiration for all who
 know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby honor Ramiro L. Esquivel on the occasion of his
 recognition by Alaniz-Valentine Chapter 598 of the Military Order
 of the Purple Heart and commend him for his sacrifice in behalf of
 our nation; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for Mr. Esquivel as an expression of high regard by the
 Texas House of Representatives.
 Herrero
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1140 was adopted by the House on April
 6, 2017, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House