House | 05/03/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Filed |