Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR144 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/28/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 144


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Countless lives were enriched by the kindness and
 wisdom of the Reverend Dr. Grayson Glass of Texas City, who passed
 away on November 6, 2016, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Grayson Glass was born in Streetman on May 22, 1929,
 to Jack and Belle Glass; an alumnus of Sweeny High School, he
 majored in music at the University of Corpus Christi and later
 earned a master's degree in theology from Southwestern Baptist
 Theological Seminary; he had a fulfilling 65-year career as a
 minister, guiding numerous congregations before assuming the
 pulpit of the First Baptist Church of Texas City, where he enjoyed
 an esteemed tenure until his retirement; he further distinguished
 himself as director of missions for the Galveston Baptist
 Association, as executive board chair of the Baptist General
 Convention of Texas, as a member of the Home Mission Board, and as a
 trustee of Houston Baptist University, which conferred on him an
 honorary doctorate; and
 WHEREAS, On September 4, 1951, Pastor Glass was joined in
 matrimony to the former Patsy Waskow, and the couple shared six and
 a half decades together; over the years, they were blessed with a
 treasured family that included two daughters, Sheri Williams and
 her husband, Tom, and Louann Graves and her husband, Thomas, as well
 as five grandchildren, Brent Seymour, Caroline and Mitchell Graves,
 and Brian and Denise Williams, and three great-grandchildren,
 Grant, Savannah, and Gabrielle Williams; and
 WHEREAS, Grayson Glass lived a caring and purposeful life
 centered around his faith, his family, and his community, and he
 will long be fondly remembered for his generous service to others;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of the Reverend
 Dr. Grayson Glass and extend sincere condolences to the members of
 his family and to his friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of the
 Reverend Dr. Grayson Glass.
 Faircloth
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 144 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on February 23, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House