Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1824 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/19/2017

                            H.R. No. 1824


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends continue to treasure their
 memories of Willie V Jordan of Newport, who endured enormous
 hardship in the service of this nation during World War II; and
 WHEREAS, Bill Jordan was born into a family of sharecroppers
 near Newport on February 10, 1922; at age 16, he went to work with
 the Civilian Conservation Corps, and in 1940, when his parents
 refused him permission to join the U.S. Navy, he enlisted in the
 Texas National Guard instead; his unit was mobilized in the months
 before Pearl Harbor, and Mr. Jordan shipped out in November 1941
 with the 2nd Battalion, 131st Field Artillery, 36th Division, of
 the U.S. Army; and
 WHEREAS, Originally destined for the Philippines, the unit
 was rerouted to Australia and then to Java, where its mission was to
 help defend the island against invasion; soon after, however, the
 Japanese launched an overwhelming assault, and the Allied troops on
 Java were forced to surrender on March 8, 1942; Mr. Jordan and his
 comrades then began a 42-month ordeal, during which they were
 forced by their captors to build what came to be known as the Death
 Railway in the jungles of Burma; and
 WHEREAS, Enduring the ravages of starvation, torture, and
 disease, Mr. Jordan and the other prisoners cleared jungle and
 carried baskets of rocks weighing as much as 100 pounds in
 torrential rain and withering heat; despite receiving injuries and
 suffering from malaria, beriberi, and dysentery, this tough young
 Texan continued to work, helping his fellow prisoners when he
 could; because he himself was able to work barefoot, he gave his
 shoes to another prisoner, who credited them with saving his life;
 and
 WHEREAS, No word of the men's plight reached the outside
 world until September 1944, so that the 2nd Battalion, 131st Field
 Artillery, came to be known as the "Lost Battalion," and it was only
 after the end of the war in the Pacific, in August 1945, that loved
 ones learned the fate of individual members of the unit; according
 to one account, of the 668 men from the battalion who went into the
 jungle, 163 died in POW camps, 133 of them while working on the
 railroad; when Mr. Jordan returned to the States, he carried less
 than 90 pounds on his six-foot frame; and
 WHEREAS, Bill Jordan continued to serve in the military, at
 bases from Maine to Alaska, for the next 15 years; he retired from
 the U.S. Air Force in 1960 and subsequently worked as a construction
 engineer for the City of Fort Worth until his retirement from that
 post in 1985; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Jordan was joined in matrimony to Florence
 Kistler, also of Newport, following his return from the war, and the
 couple raised three children; he died on October 16, 1992, and was
 laid to rest in Newport Cemetery; and
 WHEREAS, Rarely speaking of his ordeal and harboring no ill
 will toward his captors, Bill Jordan credited his survival to his
 faith in God, in his country, and in his comrades; he remained proud
 of his service throughout his life, as he devoted himself to making
 a better life for his family and to instilling in his children a
 deep respect for the same values that made him a true American hero;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Willie V Jordan and
 extend gratitude to the members of his family for preserving the
 memory of his courage, patriotism, and sacrifice.
 Springer
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1824 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 12, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House