House | 05/29/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/28/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/28/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/26/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Filed |