House | 04/11/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1118 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1118 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 936 | |
House | 01/26/2017 | Filed |