House | 05/15/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Filed |