House | 05/25/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3765 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | RV#1354 | Journal Page: 3765 |
House | 05/19/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3765 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3765 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3155 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 480 | |
House | 01/26/2017 | Filed |